IL HB0531 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of criminal building management. Provides that a person commits the offense when, having personal or professional management or control of commercial real estate, whether as a legal or equitable owner or as a managing agent or otherwise, he or she recklessly permits or causes the physical condition or facilities of the commercial real estate to become or remain in any condition which endangers the health or safety of a first responder and: (1) the condition endangering the health or safety of a first responder was a building code violation or resulted from work done with a proper permit; (2) the condition endangering the health or safety of a first responder is determined to be a contributing factor in the injury or death of that first responder; and (3) the person recklessly conceals or attempts to conceal the condition that endangered the health or safety of the first responder that is found to be a contributing factor in that injury or death. Provides that criminal building management is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-CRIMINAL BUILDING MGMT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-06-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-06-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-06-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-06-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 008-000-000
2017-06-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-017-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-5.1bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback