IL HB0522 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Repeals a provision making certain elections State holidays. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-STATE HOLIDAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10517-25Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback