IL HB0507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Allows a school board to use remaining funds on hand in the Fire Prevention and Safety Fund for dyslexia screenings for students. Makes technical corrections. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-FIRE PREV SAFETY FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-08HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105517-2.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback