IL HB0506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality or county authorized under the Code to use an automated traffic law enforcement system may not enact an ordinance providing for an automated traffic law enforcement system at the intersection of Illinois Route 83 and 22nd Street in the City of Oakbrook Terrace and any provision of an ordinance enacted by a municipality or county prior to the effective date of the bill that is inconsistent with the prohibition is null and void. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-RED LIGHT PHOTO
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. David Olsen [R] |
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | To Red Light Camera Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=506&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0506.htm |