IL HB0497 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for coal and aggregate exploration, mining, off-highway hauling, processing, maintenance, and reclamation equipment is exempt from the Acts' automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-COAL SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=497&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0497.htm |