IL HB0496 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that all townships within a coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipality may be discontinued (currently, municipalities in which the city council exercises the powers and duties of the township board, or in which one or more municipal officials serve as an officer or trustee of the township; that are located within a county with a population of 3 million or more; and which contain a territory of 7 square miles or more). Repeals an Article of the Township Code regarding discontinuance of specified townships in St. Clair County. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-TWP CONSOLIDATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-14 | House | Re-assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 27-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 27 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |