IL HB0491 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that no person may serve more than 10 consecutive years in any of the following leadership roles: Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and Minority Leader of the Senate. Provides that the limitations imposed by the amendatory Act apply to service beginning on and after January 9, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA LEADER TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25101.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback