IL HB0487 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor has previously been placed on probation for an offense that involves the use or possession of a firearm, the court may not place the minor on probation for any subsequent offense involving the use or possession of a firearm.
Title
JUV CT-PROBATION-FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-16 | House | To Juvenile Justice and System Involved Youth Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=487&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0487.htm |