IL HB0485 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no executive branch constitutional officer or member of the General Assembly may make public announcements of any State grant or State funded project of any kind within 60 days before a general election.
Title
FUNDING ANNOUNCEMENT BLACKOUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-03-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |