IL HB0479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "An Act to renew the Great Seal of State", approved March 7, 1867. Provides that the State seal shall bear the date "December 3, 1818" in recognition of the date of Illinois' statehood and that the date "December 3, 1818" shall replace any other date appearing on the State seal. Provides that any further additions or changes made to the design of the seal are wholly within the discretion of the Secretary of State. Effective immediately.
Title
ILLINOIS STATE SEAL
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-06-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2017-06-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-010-001 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-017-001 |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-01-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |