IL HB0468 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Asset Forfeiture Process and Private Property Protection Act. Provides that this Act sets out the exclusive process governing forfeitures in this State and supersedes any conflicting or inconsistent provisions under State law. Provides that forfeiture will be applicable to any State law that carries a felony sanction which explicitly includes forfeiture as a punishment for the offense. Provides that a person will only be subject to forfeit proceeds and property the person derived directly from the commission of the crime, proceeds and property directly traceable to proceeds and property derived directly from the commission of the crime, and instrumentalities the person used in the commission of the crime only if the person is convicted of violating a State law subject to forfeiture. Provides that there will be no civil asset forfeiture. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-FORFEITURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseTabled
2017-02-16HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-02-15HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback