IL HB0466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Enforcement Act. Provides that a tax purchaser or assignee must give notice of the tax sale and the date of expiration of the redemption period not less than 3 months nor more than 6 months prior to the expiration of the redemption period (currently, not less than 3 months nor more than 5 months). Provides that the purchaser or assignee may file a petition for the issuance of a tax certificate of title at any time within 6 months but not less than 3 months prior to the expiration of the redemption period (currently, any time within 5 months but not less than 3 months prior to the expiration of the redemption period). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOBILE HOME TX-NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0296
2017-08-24HouseEffective Date August 24, 2017
2017-08-24HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-04-27SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35516370Amended CodeCitation Text
35516390Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback