IL HB0458 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that any person criminally prosecuted and incarcerated prior to trial for one or more felonies by the State of Illinois which he or she did not commit may file a petition for a certificate of innocence in the circuit court of the county in which the person was incarcerated prior to trial. Provides that the petitioner must prove by a preponderance of evidence that: (1) the petitioner was incarcerated prior to trial in a prosecution which resulted in an acquittal or dismissal; (2) the prosecution did not result in a conviction of a lesser included offense; (3) the petitioner is innocent of the charges on which the petitioner's pretrial detention was based, or the charges did not constitute a felony or misdemeanor against the State; and (4) the petitioner did not by his or her own conduct voluntarily cause or bring about the charges which resulted in his or her pretrial incarceration. Amends the Court of Claims Act. Provides that a person who has been issued a certificate of innocence may file a claim against the State for time unjustly served in pretrial incarceration in a county jail. Provides that the Court of Claims shall make an award of $50,000 per year the person was wrongfully imprisoned and shall prorate that amount for a fraction of a year that the person was wrongfully imprisoned (rather than "the amount of the award is at the discretion of the court; and provided, the court shall make no award in excess of the following amounts: for imprisonment of 5 years or less, not more than $85,350; for imprisonment of 14 years or less but over 5 years, not more than $170,000; for imprisonment of over 14 years, not more than $199,150"). Provides that the court shall include the number of years the person was imprisoned awaiting trial in its determination of the award and that the court shall include an additional $25,000 for each year served on parole, probation, or registered as a sex offender after imprisonment. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PRETRIAL DETENTION-INNOCENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-13 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-03-10 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-07 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-07 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-07 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-07 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-005-000 |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |