IL HB0457 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Opportunities for At-Risk Women Act. Provides that appointments to the Task Force on Opportunities for At-Risk Women shall be made within 60 days from the effective date of this amendatory Act and that the Task Force shall meet at least quarterly. Provides that the Task Force shall report on or before January 1, 2018, and January 1 of each year thereafter. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AT-RISK WOMEN ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-07HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20507515Amended CodeCitation Text
2050755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback