IL HB0440 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that physical education may (rather than shall) be provided to pupils. Makes related changes, including changes concerning physical fitness assessments. Removes a provision concerning the State Board of Education preparing and making available guidelines for the various grades and types of schools.
Title
SCH CD-PHYSICAL EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 004-015-000 |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=440&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0440.htm |