IL HB0437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Prohibits an employer from making employee contributions on behalf of an employee, except for the sole purpose of allowing an employee to make pre-tax contributions. Provides that employment contracts or collective bargaining agreements in effect on the effective date of the amendatory Act are not subject to the prohibition, but any such contract or collective bargaining agreement that is subsequently modified, amended, or renewed or that is in effect 3 or more years after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be subject to the prohibition. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-END PENSION PICKUP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-152.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback