IL HB0428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that no person may serve more than 8 years in any of the following leadership roles: Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and Minority Leader of the Senate. Provides that the limitations imposed by the amendatory Act apply to service beginning on and after January 9, 2019.
Title
GA LEADER TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-01-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=428&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0428.htm |