IL HB0412 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Creates the Workers' Compensation Transparency Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall collect and review information and data on the effects of the changes in workers' compensation law enacted by the General Assembly and that the purpose of the collection and review of information is to make as transparent as possible all information relating to the medical treatment, legal representation, and benefits paid to injured workers in this State. Repeals the language creating the Task Force on January 1, 2022. Repeals certain requirements relating to reports and promulgation of rules concerning workers' compensation insurance by the Department of Insurance on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORK COMP TRANSPARENCY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-08HouseTo Workers Compensation Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82030529.2Amended CodeCitation Text
82030529.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback