IL HB0399 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Authorizes a credit to taxpayers for 10% of stipends or salaries paid to qualified college interns. Limits the credit to stipends and salaries paid to 5 interns each year, and limits total credits to $3,000 for all years combined. Defines a "qualified college intern". Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero and may not be carried forward or back. Exempt from the Act's sunset provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TAX CREDIT INTERNS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-24HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355224New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback