IL HB0392 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that public indecency is a Class 4 felony if committed by a person 17 years or older who is within the secure grounds of a penal institution, youth center, correctional facility, or other facility used to detain a person charged with or convicted of a criminal offense. Provides that public indecency is a Class 3 felony (rather than Class 4 felony) if committed by a person 18 years of age or older who is on or within 500 feet of elementary or secondary school grounds when children are present on the grounds. Provides that a person commits mob action when he or she engages in the knowing or reckless use of force or violence that creates a disruption in the operations or programs within a State, county, or local youth center, correctional facility, or other facility used to detain any person charged with or convicted of a criminal offense by 2 or more persons acting together and without the authority of law. Provides that a participant in a mob action who does not withdraw when commanded to do so by a peace officer or correctional facility employee commits a Class 4 felony (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Increases other criminal penalties relating to mob action. Provides that a person convicted for a violation of resisting or obstructing a peace officer, firefighter, or correctional employee whose violation was the proximate cause of an injury to a peace officer, firefighter, or correctional institution employee is guilty of a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony). Defines "youth center".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-PENALTY ENHANCEMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-30Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-9Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-23New CodeSee Bill Text
720525-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720531-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback