IL HB0388 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, subject to funding availability, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall administer a local health department clinic grant program to make grants to local health departments for development of comprehensive dental clinics for dental care services to increase dental access for medical assistance clients who have no dental arrangements with a dental provider in a project's service area. Provides that Medically Underserved Areas (MUAs) and Health Professional Shortage Areas (HPSAs) shall receive special priority for grants under this program. Provides that local health departments and Federally Qualified Health Centers (FQHCs) are eligible for grants. Sets forth limitations on the use of grant moneys. Effective immediately.
Title
HFS-LOCAL DENTAL CLINIC GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | First Reading | |
2009-02-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=388&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0388.htm |