IL HB0386 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a provision providing for the collection of an annual commercial distribution fee on vehicles of the second division weighing more than 8,000 pounds. Makes conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REPEAL COM DISTRIB FEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-26SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-003-000
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625520-101Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-402.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-815.1Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback