IL HB0367 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if Senate Bill 337 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law, then the Firearm Dealer License Certification Act is amended. Provides that the provisions of the Act concerning the certification of the license of a Federal Firearms Licensee apply only to a Federal Firearms Licensee who has been found by the federal or State government to have 3 or more firearms used in the commission of criminal offenses sold or transferred by the licensee within the 5 years prior to his or her application for certification of his or her license. Effective upon becoming law or on the date Senate Bill 337 of the 100th General Assembly takes effect, whichever is later.
Title
FIREARM DEALERS CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=367&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0367.htm |