IL HB0358 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2017 levy year, the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law applies to all taxing districts, including home rule units. Provides that, beginning with the 2017 levy year, the extension limitation under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Preempts home rule. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-PTELL FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-242 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=358&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0358.htm |