IL HB0358 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Prohibits a towing service from performing a removal of a commercial motor vehicle under that vehicle's own power without the authorization of a law enforcement officer. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
TOWING OF COMMERCIAL VEHICLES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-02-20 | House | To Towing Oversight Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 4-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |