IL HB0348 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law making conforming changes. Further amends the new Article 24 of the Township Code as follows: removes provisions regarding the scope of the Article; modifies the petition requirements to dissolve a township, including signature requirements and publication of the petition on the county's website; modifies the referendum wording; clarifies that road districts that are to be dissolved must be wholly within the boundaries of the township; adds examples of duties that are transferred to the county; limits specified taxes and proceeds of the sale of specified properties to the use and benefit of the geographic area of the dissolved township; provides that reductions in spending within the boundaries of the former township and specified tax levies may be used to pay down liabilities of the former township; provides that if a no municipality makes an offer or a municipality doesn't make a satisfactory offer (rather than only no offers made) to take over part of a dissolved road district, then the county may retain the powers over the road district; provides that elected and appointed township officers and road commissioners shall cease to hold office on the date of dissolution of the township and road districts, no longer be compensated, and do not have legal recourse relating to the ceasing of their elected or appointed positions upon the ceasing of their offices. Effective immediately.
Title
MCHENRY TWP & DIST DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0230 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-003-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-033-005 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 014-004-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 011-004-001 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 28-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1184 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 24-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 24 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 6-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |