IL HB0348 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Constitutional Amendment Act. Provides that when the Secretary of State first publishes a proposed constitutional amendment in a newspaper or newspapers, he or she shall also cause the existing form of the constitutional provision proposed to be amended, the proposed amendment, the explanation of the amendment, the arguments for and against the amendment, and the form in which the amendment will appear on the separate ballot, to be published on a publicly accessible Internet website controlled by the Office of the Secretary of State. Provides that the newspaper or newspapers containing the published amendment shall also provide a link to the amendment information published on the Secretary's Internet website. Removes language requiring the Secretary to issue a pamphlet concerning a proposed constitutional amendment. Amends the Election Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSTITUTION AMEND PUBLICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-29SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-26SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-11HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails 114-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-16HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10512A-55Amended CodeCitation Text
5202Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=348&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0348ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0348_03162017_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0348_05112017_002000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0348_05162017_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0348_05312017_006000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback