IL HB0343 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that an applicant who has been awarded a Credit under the Act may, in the applicant's sole discretion, opt to retain taxes withheld under the Illinois Income Tax Act in lieu of an income tax credit. Provides that the amount of withheld taxes retained by the applicant in a taxable year may not exceed the amount of the Credit awarded by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for that taxable year. Provides that each employee whose taxes were withheld by an employer who retains amounts under this subsection must receive credit for 100% of the taxes withheld from his or her pay. Requires the Department to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on the progress of the incentive payment program. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make corresponding changes concerning tax withholding. Effective immediately.
Title
EDGE-INCENTIVE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 10 | 5-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=343&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0343.htm |