IL HB0339 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the holder of a gift certificate issued on or after January 1, 2010 that has a balance of less than $10 must be given the option of receiving that balance in cash. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
GIFT CERT-UNDER $10 PAY CASH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-05 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-02-05 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-27 | First Reading | |
2009-01-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=339&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0339.htm |