IL HB0332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code to add provisions concerning student data privacy. Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Makes changes to the definition provisions. Sets forth provisions allowing disclosure of student records to researchers at an accredited post-secondary educational institution or an organization conducting research if specified requirements are met. Amends the Children's Privacy Protection and Parental Empowerment Act to change the definition of "child" to mean a person under the age of 18 (instead of 16).
Title
STUDENT DATA PRIVACY
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g) |
2017-03-29 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-002-000; - Sub-committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-003-000; - Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
325 | 17 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=332&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0332.htm |