IL HB0331 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education, in conjunction with the Department of Public Health, to establish a calorie transparency program, to be implemented in the public schools of this State. Provides that the purpose of the program shall be to reduce obesity by educating students on healthy eating habits and the importance of being aware of the contents of the food they eat. Provides that a school board shall require each school to conspicuously display the nutritional information of all food items offered for sale to students on school property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOLS-CALORIE TRANSPARENCY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
10552-3.170New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback