IL HB0330 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Recyclable Metal Purchase Registration Law. Creates the Recyclable Metal Theft Task Force within the Office of the Secretary of State. Provides that the Task Force shall endeavor to establish a collaborative effort to combat recyclable metal theft throughout the State, assist in developing regional task forces to combat recyclable metal theft, and consider and develop long-term solutions for the rising problem of recyclable metal thefts in this State. Requires the Task Force to report its findings annually to the General Assembly and Governor.
Title
RECYCLABLE METAL TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] |
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0052 |
2015-07-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |