IL HB0326 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, no later than August 1, 2015, the Governor shall select 5 specific programs, each administered by a different State agency, to serve as test cases for the introduction of a continual performance measurement system. Provides that the Governor and the Director of the applicable State agency shall jointly identify specific and measurable goals for the test program to meet and shall monitor and evaluate the Agency's effectiveness in meeting those goals. Provides that certain information shall be included on the Agency's website and the budgeting for results website. Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability shall review the process and the results for the test cases and shall report its findings to the General Assembly annually. Effective immediately.
Title
AGENCIES-TEST CASES
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=326&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0326.htm |