IL HB0325 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no former officer, former member, or former State employee and no employee or immediate family member of a former officer, former member, or former State employee shall engage in lobbying for a period of 2 years after the last day of the most recent term of office to which the former officer was elected or, if not elected, for a period of 2 years after the former officer, former member, or former State employee ended his or her employment with the State. Makes a violation of these requirements a Class 4 felony. Authorizes the imposition of a fine in an amount equal to the total amount of salary, compensation, or any other form of payment that the person received in connection with the prohibited activity. Defines "immediate family member". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS ACT-LOBBY RESTRICTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54301-5Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-47New CodeSee Bill Text
543050-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback