IL HB0321 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - To Income Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the State Tax Lien Registration Act and the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Reenacts the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Changes various Acts by restoring language deleted by Public Act 100-22 and deleting language added by Public Act 100-22, including, but not limited to, the following changes: (1) amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to provide that: (A) for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2019 and beginning prior to January 1, 2025, the income tax rates shall be (i) 3.75% for individuals, trusts, and estates and (ii) 5.25% for corporations; (B) for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2025, the income tax rates shall be (i) 3.25% for individuals, trusts, and estates and (ii) 4.8% for corporations; (C) the research and development credit does not apply for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2019 (currently, January 1, 2022); (D) provides that the maximum amount of the education expense credit is reduced from $750 to $500 per year; (E) repeals an addition modification for amounts deducted under the Internal Revenue Code for domestic manufacturing and other activities; and (F) repeals provisions disallowing certain exemptions for taxpayers with an income above a certain limit; (2) repeals the State Tax Lien Database; (3) amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act to provide that: (A) the graphic arts machinery exemption sunsets on July 1, 2019 and (B) the manufacturing and assembling machinery and equipment exemption is no longer permanent. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL/RESTORE VARIOUS-SB9

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
154059Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.02Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.03Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.04Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.05Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.06Amended CodeCitation Text
20120518.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2012057Amended CodeCitation Text
20520510090Amended CodeCitation Text
2052054013Amended CodeCitation Text
2052059012Amended CodeCitation Text
20530510Amended CodeCitation Text
20530562Amended CodeCitation Text
20540515.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
20540519.3Amended CodeCitation Text
205548Amended CodeCitation Text
205548.1Amended CodeCitation Text
205548.3Amended CodeCitation Text
205565Amended CodeCitation Text
2056206-14Amended CodeCitation Text
20565730Amended CodeCitation Text
20570010Amended CodeCitation Text
21515522Amended CodeCitation Text
21518515Amended CodeCitation Text
21518520Amended CodeCitation Text
2151855Amended CodeCitation Text
2155210Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
301056b-1Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.12Amended CodeCitation Text
302302Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-50Amended CodeCitation Text
351102Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351152Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-45Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351205aAmended CodeCitation Text
351205bAmended CodeCitation Text
351205cAmended CodeCitation Text
3551102Amended CodeCitation Text
3551103Amended CodeCitation Text
3551105Amended CodeCitation Text
3551501Amended CodeCitation Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text
355204Amended CodeCitation Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text
355225Repealed CodeCitation Text
355901Amended CodeCitation Text
3552016Amended CodeCitation Text
3552017Amended CodeCitation Text
3552019Amended CodeCitation Text
35750ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
51001-5Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-3034Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-15Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-17Amended CodeCitation Text
75552-1Amended CodeCitation Text
75552-2Amended CodeCitation Text
76510250.05Amended CodeCitation Text
76510251Amended CodeCitation Text
76510251.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102510Amended CodeCitation Text
765102510.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102510.6Amended CodeCitation Text
765102511Amended CodeCitation Text
765102511.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102512Amended CodeCitation Text
765102513Amended CodeCitation Text
765102514Amended CodeCitation Text
765102515Amended CodeCitation Text
765102516Amended CodeCitation Text
765102517Amended CodeCitation Text
765102518Amended CodeCitation Text
765102519Amended CodeCitation Text
765102519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
76510252Amended CodeCitation Text
765102520Amended CodeCitation Text
765102521Amended CodeCitation Text
765102522Amended CodeCitation Text
765102523Amended CodeCitation Text
765102523.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102524Amended CodeCitation Text
765102524.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102525Amended CodeCitation Text
765102525.5Amended CodeCitation Text
765102526Amended CodeCitation Text
765102527Amended CodeCitation Text
765102528Amended CodeCitation Text
765102529Amended CodeCitation Text
765102529.5Amended CodeCitation Text
76510252aAmended CodeCitation Text
76510253Amended CodeCitation Text
765102530Amended CodeCitation Text
76510253aAmended CodeCitation Text
76510254Amended CodeCitation Text
76510255Amended CodeCitation Text
76510256Amended CodeCitation Text
76510257Amended CodeCitation Text
76510257aAmended CodeCitation Text
76510258Amended CodeCitation Text
76510258.1Amended CodeCitation Text
76510258.2Amended CodeCitation Text
76510259Amended CodeCitation Text
7651025Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
7651026ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
770903Amended CodeCitation Text
805105112.70Amended CodeCitation Text
805512.70Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback