IL HB0321 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals Section providing authority to use automated traffic law enforcement systems at intersections in which cameras are used to photograph or video record a motor vehicle's failure to stop and yield as required by traffic control signals. Denies home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State. Makes conforming and other technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseTo Red Light Camera Subcommittee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
62551-105.2Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
625511-208.8Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-400Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback