IL HB0319 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of making a false statement to a peace officer or criminal investigative officer. Provides that a person commits the offense if: (1) the person knowingly makes a false statement to a peace officer or criminal investigative officer of the State or a unit of local government regarding a criminal matter that the person knows to be under investigation by the officer; and (2) during the interview, the person is first informed by a prosecutor who is working with the officer on the investigation that a knowing false statement to the officer relating to the investigation would constitute a criminal offense. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FALSE STATEMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720531-4.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback