IL HB0304 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the tuition rate and fee limit of 1/3 of the per capita cost applies until the effective date of the amendatory Act and beginning again 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-TUITION RATES & FEES
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-003-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |