IL HB0301 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that if an agency decides to hold a public hearing, it shall post on its Internet website certain requisite information to provide the public with notice of the proposed rulemaking. Provides that if an agency decides not to initiate a public hearing, it shall post the requirements to request a public hearing, along with information on the proposed rulemaking, on its Internet website. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RULES PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Government Transparency Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback