IL HB0297 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Salaries Act. Decreases the annual salary of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, Comptroller, Treasurer, and Attorney General by 10% beginning the second Monday of January 2023. Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Decreases the annual salary and committee service stipends of General Assembly members by 10% beginning the second Wednesday of January 2021 for each member of the House of Representatives and each member of the Senate elected to a 2-year term commencing January 9, 2019 and beginning January 11, 2023 for all other members of the Senate. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REDUCE GA & EXECUTIVE SALARIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text
52901Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback