IL HB0293 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the sunset of exemptions, credits, and deductions.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-11-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-11-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2016-11-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |