IL HB0292 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to increase rates and reimbursements in effect on June 30, 2021 payable to Illinois not-for-profit community-based agencies in order to increase access utilization of individual and group supported employment, increase acuity-based rate differentials in on-site and off-site community day services, and other matters. Provides that beginning January 1, 2022, for a medical assistance recipient who is a resident in a facility licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements (CILA) Licensure and Certification Act, the State shall pay an amount in addition to the minimum monthly personal needs allowance authorized under the Social Security Act so that the person's total monthly personal needs allowance from both State and federal sources equals $90. Provides that beginning no later than October 1, 2022, residents of CILA facilities who are eligible for medical assistance and are enrolled in the State's home and community-based services waiver program for adults with developmental disabilities shall retain all earned income from employment or community day services activities. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. In a provision requiring the State Use Committee to review the pricing of supplies and services procured by the State from a qualified not-for-profit agency for persons with significant disabilities, provides that the Committee may consider during its review certain factors including, but not limited to, amounts private businesses would pay for similar products or services. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0343 |
2021-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-07-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-16 | House | House Concurs |
2021-06-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2021-06-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-05-06 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-36.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | Amended Code | Citation Text |