IL HB0289 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Provides for the establishment and operation within the Office of the Auditor General of an Appropriations Earmark Unit to conduct performance audits of earmarked appropriations that become law. Requires operation of a telephone hot line to receive anonymous suggestions for audits of grant programs and earmarked appropriations. Requires the audits to be public records and filed with the Legislative Audit Commission. Requires a majority vote of the Commission in order to direct the Auditor General to cease conducting an audit. Effective July 1, 2009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE AUDITING ACT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-02 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-03 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0005
2009-04-03 Effective Date April 3, 2009
2009-04-03 Governor Approved
2009-04-02 Sent to the Governor
2009-04-02 Passed Both Houses
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 116-000-000
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 116-000-000
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
2009-04-02 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-004
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-004
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-004
2009-04-02 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-004
2009-04-02 Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2009-04-02 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2009-04-02 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2009-04-02 Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2009-04-02 Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4
2009-04-02 Arrived in House
2009-04-02 Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2009-04-02 3/5 Vote Required
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
2009-04-02 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2009-04-02 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Radogno
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Radogno
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sullivan
2009-04-02 Recalled to Second Reading
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
2009-04-02 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
2009-04-02 Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2009-04-01 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009
2009-03-31 Second Reading
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2009-03-31 Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-000-000
2009-03-31 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2009-03-31 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Waive Posting Notice
2009-03-31 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2009-03-31 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-31 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2009-03-31 Waive Posting Notice
2009-03-31 Assigned to Executive
2009-03-30 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-30 First Reading
2009-03-27 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2009-03-27 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2009-03-25 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
2009-03-25 Arrive in Senate
2009-03-24 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2009-03-03 Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2009-03-03 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-03 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2009-03-03 Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-26 Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2009-02-25 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-000-000
2009-02-25 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2009-02-25 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-25 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
2009-02-24 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-24 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-20 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2009-02-20 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
2009-02-20 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-19 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000
2009-02-19 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2009-02-19 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
2009-02-10 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2009-02-09 Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
2009-02-04 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2009-01-23 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-01-23 First Reading
2009-01-22 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback