IL HB0285 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Increases the minimum penalties by 3 years for knowingly manufacturing or delivering, or possessing with intent to manufacture or deliver, 15 grams or more of heroin.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-HEROIN DELIVERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=285&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0285.htm |