IL HB0279 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Allows each member of the General Assembly to nominate persons from his or her district, which persons shall receive a certificate of scholarship in a State university designated by the member. Sets forth provisions concerning such nominations, including the number of persons a member may nominate and the length of the scholarships. Provides for the waiver of confidentiality as a condition of nomination. Provides for the use of a scholarship, including that the scholarship exempts the holder from the payment of tuition and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-RESTORE GA SCHOLARSHIP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseTo Higher Education Analysis Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-09HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105530-10Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-11Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-12.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-13Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-13.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105530-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback