IL HB0277 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish a prescription drug repository program, under which any person may donate a prescription drug or supplies needed to administer a prescription drug for use by an individual who meets eligibility criteria specified by the Department. Sets forth requirements that prescription drugs or supplies must meet in order to be accepted and dispensed under the program. Provides that no drugs or supplies donated under the prescription drug repository program may be resold. Provides that nothing in the Act requires that a pharmacy or pharmacist participate in the prescription drug repository program. Provides for civil and criminal immunity for drug and supply manufacturers and individuals in relation to the donation, acceptance, or dispensing of prescription drugs or supplies under the prescription drug repository program. Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act, the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act to provide that persons engaged in donating or accepting, or packaging, repackaging, or labeling, prescription drugs to the extent permitted or required under the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act are exempt from provisions of those other Acts that might prohibit or otherwise regulate such activity.
Title
IDPH-PRESCRIPT DRUG REPOSITORY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-05-15 | Sponsor Removed Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-14 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-04-23 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-012-001 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-02 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-04-02 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-04-02 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-24 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-03-03 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-03 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-02-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-02-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-02-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-02-25 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-25 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-06 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-21 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |