IL HB0270 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Law Enforcement Sexual Assault Investigation Act. Provides that allegations of sexual assault by a police officer while performing his or her duties shall immediately be reported to the police officer's supervisory or command personnel and an independent law enforcement agency. Provides that the independent law enforcement agency shall conduct a formal investigation of the allegations and provide written findings and recommendations to the State's Attorney and police officer's supervisory or command personnel which may be the basis for filing charges seeking the police officer's removal, discharge, or suspension. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall adopt written protocols and guidelines for the investigation of law enforcement officers accused of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVESTIGATIONS OF POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-07-06HousePassed Both Houses
2017-07-06HouseHouse Concurs
2017-07-06House3/5 Vote Required
2017-07-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000
2017-06-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-000
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-03-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-06HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-02-06HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-01-17HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-27HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507057.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=270&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0270sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0270_04272017_050000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0270_05312017_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0270_07062017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback