IL HB0266 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to the administration of State assessments, prohibits the State Board of Education from assessing any student whose parent or guardian has requested that the student not be assessed. Requires the State Board to develop a form that allows for such requests, which form must be distributed by school districts to their students. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ST ASSESSMENTS-OPT OUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 006-011-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-22 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.64a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=266&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0266.htm |