IL HB0265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lead in Schools Reporting Act. Provides that on an annual basis the Department of Public Health, in coordination with local departments of public health serving the City of Chicago, shall conduct specified lead testing at public school facilities within the City. Provides that the results from such testing shall be transmitted to the State Board of Education. Provides that the Department shall notify the Board if a detected lead level meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Amends the School Code. Provides that school report cards for cities with populations in excess of 500,000 shall include lead testing results and that students in such districts may transfer from one attendance center to another attendance center in that district if any lead levels at his or her current attendance center meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Makes other changes to provisions concerning transfers to specified attendance centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH REPORT CARD-LEAD-CHICAGO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17aAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.24Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback