IL HB0261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Education for Homeless Children Act. Provides that if a child loses permanent housing and becomes a homeless person, within the meaning of the Act, and the parent or guardian of the child finds temporary housing or shelter that still renders the child homeless within the meaning of the Act and if the school district of the child's school of origin is thereby required to pay the transportation costs of the child to and from his or her school of origin and the school district can save money by providing housing assistance to the parent or guardian of the child such that it would allow the child to attend his or her school of origin instead of providing transportation to and from the child's school of origin, then the school district may, at its discretion, provide rental or mortgage assistance. Sets forth provisions concerning the amount of assistance, providing the assistance indirectly through a homeless assistance agency, providing assistance to those at risk of homelessness, the length of assistance provided, and the school district funds from which the assistance may be drawn. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUC-HOMELESS CHILD-ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0332 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-015-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-002-000 |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |